Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime de Copóns y de Tamarit

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1665AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
Apr 1665³Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
18 Dec 1673AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
14 Apr 1680DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Copóns y de Tamarit
Bishop Jaime de Copóns y de Tamarit (died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Pedro de las Pueblas, Church, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 200, Number 1,253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast