Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Conzié

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Feb 1380AppointedBishop of Grenoble, France
24 Dec 1383AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
20 Jan 1388AppointedBishop of Arles, France
1390¹ResignedAdministrator of Avignon, France
17 Oct 1390AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
19 Sep 1391AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
31 Dec 1432DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Conzié
Archbishop François de Conzié (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 103, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 124
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast