Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gasparo Cardinal Contarini

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Administrator of Salisbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1483Born
21 May 153551.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 153551.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
15 Sep 153551.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro
19 Sep 153551.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
23 Oct 153653.0AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
15 Jan 153753.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
Jun 153753.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 153854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno, Italy
23 Jul 153955.7AppointedAdministrator of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 153956.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
15 Feb 154258.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
24 Aug 154258.8DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gasparo Contarini (VIAF: 5009389)
Gasparo Cardinal Contarini (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)S. Petronio, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Current)Family Tomb, S. Maria dell'Orto, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 5.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 May 1535
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 131, and Page 292
  • ob/c2: AT, 15 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,112
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,538, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast