Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Cauco (Cocco)

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹Born
20 Nov 152838.8AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
11 Mar 153444.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
1565¹75.0DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cauco (Cocco)
Archbishop Giacomo Cauco (Cocco) (born 1490, died 1565) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1534, Number 2
  • bp/d: AT, 12 Jun 2019
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,502
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,502

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast