Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cherigato

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1522²Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 1522AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
7 Dec 1523Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
Nov 1539³DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cherigato
Bishop Francesco Cherigato (died Nov 1539) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Onofrio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 17.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112
  • b/c2+: CB, 19 Dec 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,523, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast