Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Cherchemont

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1324AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
18 Feb 1326AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
26 Jan 1373DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Cherchemont
Bishop Jean de Cherchemont (died ) Bishop of Amiens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 493, and Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast