Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Antonio Chau Quispe

Auxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru

Titular Bishop of Aveia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1967 Born
16 Jul 199830.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
30 Jan 200941.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
30 Jan 200941.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aveia
19 Apr 200941.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aveia
4 Jul 201951.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Raúl Antonio Chau Quispe
Bishop Raúl Antonio Chau Quispe (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Arequipa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,155
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast