Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Cénalis

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1522AppointedBishop of Vence, France
20 Jun 1530AppointedBishop of Riez, France
17 Apr 1532AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
7 Apr 1560DiedBishop of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Robert Cénalis
Bishop Robert Cénalis (died ) Bishop of Avranches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1522, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast