Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cavazza

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1428AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
7 Jan 1433AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
11 Apr 1440AppointedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia
May 1452³DiedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cavazza
Bishop Angelo Cavazza (died May 1452) Bishop of Trogir (Trał)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 212, and Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast