Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marino Ascanio Cardinal Caracciolo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1468Born
18 Jan 152456.0AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
24 Jul 152456.5ResignedBishop of Catania, Italy
29 Nov 152961.9AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
9 Mar 153062.1ResignedBishop of Catania, Italy
21 May 153567.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
31 May 153567.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 153567.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
1 Sep 153668.6AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
8 Jan 153769.0ResignedBishop of Catania, Italy
28 Jan 153870.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marino Ascanio Caracciolo (VIAF: 305115037)
Marino Ascanio Cardinal Caracciolo (born 1468, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 May 1535
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast