Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Capizucchi

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1533AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
14 Feb 1535Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
6 Aug 1539DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Capizucchi
Bishop Paolo Capizucchi (died ) Bishop of Nicastro

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 1
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,504
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast