Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Spínola

Deceased

Administrator of Savona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare

Administrator of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1482¹Born
19 Dec 150927.9AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
3 May 152745.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 152745.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
17 Jul 152846.5AppointedAdministrator of Savona, Italy
15 Feb 152947.1ResignedBishop of Perugia, Italy
5 Sep 153452.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
10 May 153553.3AppointedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy
18 Oct 153755.7DiedAdministrator of Savona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Spínola
Agostino Cardinal Spínola (born 1482, died ) Administrator of Savona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona, Diocese of Savona
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 May 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271, and Page 291
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast