Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Campeggi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
14 May 156863.3AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
13 Jun 156863.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
1569²64.0DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Campeggi (VIAF: 42652014)
Bishop Camillo Campeggi O.P. (born 1505, died 1569) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Ordained BishopSanto Domenico, Church, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova
Death PlaceSutri, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sutri, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,676
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 11
  • c34/loc: AT, 13 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast