Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Cacace

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1715Born
23 May 173924.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 176146.1AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
31 May 176146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
177862.7DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cacace
Bishop Giuseppe Cacace (born , died 1778) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast