Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Cabeza de Vaca

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1523AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
22 Jun 1530AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
14 Apr 1537AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
22 Nov 1550DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Cabeza de Vaca
Bishop Luis Cabeza de Vaca (died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaén, Diocese of Jaén

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 36, Number 160
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast