Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Nykyta Budka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Canada (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1877Born
25 Oct 190528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jul 191235.1AppointedBishop of Canada (Ukrainian)
15 Jul 191235.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
13 Oct 191235.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
9 Nov 192851.4ResignedBishop of Canada (Ukrainian)
1 Oct 194972.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Canada (Ukrainian)
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Nykyta Budka
Bishop Bl. Nykyta Budka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Canada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDobromirka
Ordained BishopLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 68
  • r/c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • bpc: CB, 16 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,956
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast