Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignazio-Gaetano Cardinal Boncompagni-Ludovisi

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1743Born
17 Jul 177532.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Nov 177532.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 177532.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
177632.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
29 Jun 178542.4AppointedSecretary of State
29 Jan 178744.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
30 Mar 178946.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
30 Sep 178946.6ResignedSecretary of State
30 Sep 178946.6ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
9 Aug 179047.5DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Ignazio-Gaetano Boncompagni-Ludovisi (VIAF: 61123933)
Ignazio-Gaetano Cardinal Boncompagni-Ludovisi (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBagni di Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Family Tomb, S. Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 15.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jul 1775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast