Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrija Bogdani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje, North Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
27 Feb 165146.1AppointedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
Apr 1651²46.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
6 Mar 165651.1AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
18 Dec 167570.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
1677²72.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
6 Sep 167772.6ResignedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
1683¹78.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Skopje, North Macedonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrija Bogdani
Archbishop Andrija Bogdani (born 1605, died 1683) Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGjonaj (Guri), Diocese of Prizren, Serbia
Ordained BishopDubrovnik, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67
  • obp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 37
  • ob/c2: AT, 15 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast