Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Baldanzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1789Born
18 Sep 181324.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 185161.6AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
13 Apr 185161.6Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
28 Sep 185566.1AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
7 Mar 186676.5DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Baldanzi (VIAF: 32341546)
Archbishop Ferdinando Baldanzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato
Ordained BishopSanta Cecilia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1851, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast