Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Thomas Becket

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1118Born
24 May 116243.4SelectedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
2 Jun 116243.4Ordained PriestPriest of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
3 Jun 116243.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
29 Dec 117052.0DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
21 Feb 1173Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Thomas Becket (VIAF: 100187947)
Archbishop St. Thomas Becket (born , died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a priest for 8.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 8
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 48
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast