Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Foliot, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1148AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
5 Sep 1148Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
24 Mar 1163AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
18 Feb 1187DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Foliot
Bishop Gilbert Foliot O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Omer, France

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 47
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 457
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 282
  • ab: CB, 14 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,883

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast