Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine du Bec-Crespin

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1447AppointedBishop of Paris, France
3 Mar 1449AppointedBishop of Laon, France
18 Jan 1460AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
15 Oct 1472DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine du Bec-Crespin
Archbishop Antoine du Bec-Crespin (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199, and Page 173
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast