Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rigaud Asser

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1320AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
16 Nov 1320Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 1323DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Rigaud Asser
Bishop Rigaud Asser (died ) Bishop of Winchester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Alban

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 530
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,760

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast