Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gerardo Cardinal Bianchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1220¹Born
12 Mar 127858.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
12 Mar 127858.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Apr 128161.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
1 Mar 130282.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Bianchi (VIAF: 52127473)
Gerardo Cardinal Bianchi (born 1220, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGainage

  • a cardinal for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast