Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marko Andrijasevic (Andreassi)

Deceased

Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670¹Born
Jan 1696³26.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 171747.3AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
Jun 1717²47.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
20 Dec 172353.9AppointedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
24 Apr 174070.3DiedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marko Andrijasevic (Andreassi)
Archbishop Marko Andrijasevic (Andreassi) (born 1670, died ) Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePomoni, Diocese of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
Death PlaceDubrovnik

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 289, and Page 360
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 24
  • b: CB, 30 Aug 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2/dp: CB, 12 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 6 Jan 2021

Quantcast