Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Alamandi

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Oct 1465AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
20 Jul 1466Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
8 Mar 1475AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
15 Jul 1476AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
1493¹DiedBishop of Cahors, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Alamandi
Bishop Antonio Alamandi (died 1493) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 123, and Page 130
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,480
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1466, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast