Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Airoldi

Apostolic Administrator of Monze, Zambia

Priest of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1968² Born
10 Oct 199325.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Jun 199426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Jan 202153.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Monze, Zambia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Airoldi
Father Francesco Airoldi (born 1968) Apostolic Administrator of Monze

EventPlace
Ordained DeaconCollegiata di San Vittore Martire, Corbetta, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Monze.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 26 Jan 2021
  • by: AM, 25 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast