Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Affatatis

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1547AppointedBishop of Acci (Accia), France
20 Feb 1547Ordained BishopBishop of Acci (Accia), France
3 Jul 1553AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
1557²DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Affatatis
Bishop Pierre de Affatatis (died 1557) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 246, and Page 92
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 2
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,684

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast