Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Jacob Abiad

Deceased

Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1916Born
28 Aug 194125.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 197154.9AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
29 Aug 197155.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
31 Jul 198266.2DiedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jacob Abiad
Archbishop Joseph Jacob Abiad (born , died ) Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDeir-ez-Zor

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast