Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Konrad von Abensberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1106AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 Oct 1115Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 Apr 1147DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Abensberg
Archbishop Konrad von Abensberg (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGuastalla

  • a bishop for 31.5 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 307
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,783

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast