Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginbert , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
Aug 1125³AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Aug 1125Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 Sep 1140DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reginbert
Bishop Reginbert O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: ATh, 12 Oct 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast