Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Baptiste Magenties, S.C.I. di Béth. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Tali [Dali], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1896Born
1920²23.4ProfessedMember of Priests of the Sacred Heart of Jesus of Bétharram
12 Jul 192528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Priests of the Sacred Heart of Jesus of Bétharram
13 Nov 193135.2AppointedSuperior of Tali [Dali], China
13 Dec 193539.3AppointedPrefect of Tali [Dali], China
9 Dec 194852.3ResignedPrefect of Tali [Dali], China
Feb 1990³93.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Tali [Dali], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Magenties
Father Jean-Baptiste Magenties S.C.I. di Béth. (born , died Feb 1990) Prefect Emeritus of Tali [Dali]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOssun, Diocese of Tarbes, France

  • a priest for 64.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast