Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sakania-Kipushi

Dioecesis Sakaniensis-Kipushiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gaston Kashala Ruwezi, S.D.B., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 5 March 1977
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 40,000 (15,450 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, Kafubu-Kipushi, B.P. 521, Lubumbashi; B.P. 135, Kipushi, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (990)70.20.409; 70.19.194

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Luapula Superiore
12 May 1925ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Katanga (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Luapula Superiore (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sakania
14 November 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Luapula Superiore Vicariate Apostolic of Sakania
Diocese of Sakania
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sakania Diocese of Sakania
Diocese of Sakania-Kipushi
5 March 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Sakania Diocese of Sakania-Kipushi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Sakania
195019,47945,00043.3%36365415119ap1951
Diocese of Sakania
197072,840148,41049.1%60621225978842ap1971
Diocese of Sakania-Kipushi
198075,000160,21546.8%239411,82952385ap1981
1990103,000191,00053.9%1335482,14562507ap1991
1999109,480203,51553.8%1326392,80759478ap2000
2000109,880203,91553.9%2126472,33763448ap2001
2001109,975203,99553.9%1722392,81959488ap2002
2002109,975203,99553.9%2021412,68269468ap2003
2003109,975203,99553.9%2024442,49973518ap2004
2004109,975203,99553.9%2124452,44375548ap2005
2010246,056573,00042.9%2120416,001675615ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 3 Sep 2012