Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Meixian [Kaying]

Dioecesis Chiaimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 67,000 (25,878 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, via Shantou, Meixian, Guangdong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian]
20 February 1929ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian]
18 June 1935ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian] Vicariate Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian]
Diocese of Meixian [Kaying]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian] Diocese of Meixian [Kaying]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Meixian [Kaying]
195022,8192,625,000.9%1516317363126ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012