Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Benghazi

Apostolicus Vicariatus Berenicensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sylvester Carmel Magro, O.F.M., Vicar Apostolic

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 22 June 1939
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Libya
  • Square Kilometers: 609,000 (235,226 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Maria Immacolata Catholic Church, P.O. Box 248, Benghazi, Libya
  • Telephone: (061)90.81.599
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Libia
23 February 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Libia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Cirenaica
3 February 1927Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Libia Vicariate Apostolic of Cirenaica
22 June 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cirenaica Vicariate Apostolic of Derna (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Benghazi
22 June 1939Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cirenaica Vicariate Apostolic of Benghazi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Benghazi
19501,450120,0001.2%8818111333ap1951
19699,979700,0001.4%131376722937ap1971
197815,000970,0001.5%662,5006951ap1981
19908,0001,827,000.4%661,3336701ap1991
199915,0002,147,000.7%662,5006401ap2000
200015,0001,048,5001.4%662,5006361ap2001
20017,0001,048,500.7%1671,0006345ap2002
20024,0001,048,500.4%1458004375ap2003
20034,0001,485,500.3%1458004375ap2004
20044,0001,048,500.4%1566665375ap2005
20116,0001,230,000.5%661,0006346ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 20 Oct 2012