Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Manuel de Z˙˝iga Sotomayor y Mendoza, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1646³BornSan Esteban de la Sierra
21 Mar 169548.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
19 Jun 169548.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
14 Dec 171266.1DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Manuel de Z˙˝iga Sotomayor y Mendoza:
Bishop Francisco Manuel de Z˙˝iga Sotomayor y Mendoza O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 237, Number 1,471
  • bp: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1695, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015