Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Zoghbe

Deceased

Archbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1831¹Born
29 Dec 186130.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 190675.1AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
11 Feb 190675.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
28 Oct 191079.8DiedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Zoghbe
Archbishop Pierre Zoghbe (born 1831, died ) Archbishop of Cipro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornet Chéhouan

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,407
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast