Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Zapata y Cisneros

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1550Born
17 Aug 158736.8AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
Nov 1587³37.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
13 May 159645.5AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
11 Sep 160049.9AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
9 Jun 160453.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 160454.0ResignedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Jun 160554.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
5 Jun 160655.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
17 Oct 161666.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
27 Apr 163584.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonio Zapata y Cisneros (VIAF: 36714767)
Antonio Cardinal Zapata y Cisneros (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Franciscans Discalced, Convent, Barajas

  • a bishop for 47.4 years
  • a cardinal for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,322
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,817
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 268, and Page 200
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 100, Number 624
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast