Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Pérez, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1562BornSanto Domingo de Silos
17 May 162765.0AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 Aug 162765.3Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
21 Feb 163370.8AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
28 Nov 163371.6AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
1 May 163775.0DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pérez:
Archbishop Antonio Pérez O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 353
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013