Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arcangelo Gualtieri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jun 1612AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
24 Jun 1612Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
1619¹DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Gualtieri:
Archbishop Arcangelo Gualtieri O.F.M. , Archbishop of Monreale

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 291
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015