Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grzegorz Zachariasiewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1740Born
2 Aug 176020.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
27 Mar 180968.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 Mar 180968.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
3 Jul 180969.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
16 May 181473.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Zachariasiewicz (VIAF: 102230735)
Bishop Grzegorz Zachariasiewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLwów

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,684
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,798
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast