Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eberhard von Dienheim

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹Born
20 Dec 158141.9SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
19 Feb 158242.1ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Jan 158444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
10 Oct 161070.7DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eberhard von Dienheim (VIAF: 20071290)
Bishop Eberhard von Dienheim (born 1540, died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChateau, Udenheim

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast