Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Melchior Cardinal von Meckau

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440²Born
22 Mar 148242.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
20 Apr 148242.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Apr 1488³48.2SucceededBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
15 Jul 148848.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
31 May 150363.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150363.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
5 Jan 150767.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
3 Mar 150969.1DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchior von Meckau (VIAF: 6000618)
Melchior Cardinal von Meckau (born 1440, died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeissen, Diocese of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Araceli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,413
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,902
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1488, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast