Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Révol, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orange


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1349AppointedBishop of Orange, France
22 Mar 1349Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
30 Sep 1367DiedBishop of Orange, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Révol:
Bishop Jean de Révol O.P. (died ) Bishop of Orange

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 117
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014