Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio Vallejo Mejía, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jan 1581ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
2 Dec 1619AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
6 Aug 1620Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
22 Jun 1630SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
10 Feb 1631ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
29 Oct 1635DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Vallejo Mejía
Bishop Ambrosio Vallejo Mejía O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,386
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 347
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 139, Number 885
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast