Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Daniel von Rauchnach

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹BornSchillentabor
17 Apr 167043.2SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
15 Dec 167043.9ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
1 Feb 167144.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
9 Dec 168659.9DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Daniel von Rauchnach:
Bishop Andreas Daniel von Rauchnach (died ) Bishop of Pedena

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015