Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santos Ubierna, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Thái Binh, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Lamdia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1907Born
20 Dec 193023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Feb 194234.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thái Binh, Viet Nam
24 Feb 194234.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
21 Sep 194234.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
15 Apr 195547.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Thái Binh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Santos Ubierna
Bishop Santos Ubierna O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Thái Binh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuérmeces, Spain

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 31 Mar 2020

Quantcast