Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manel María Trujillo Jurado, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albarracin

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abbot/Alcala la Real)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1728BornBaena
3 Dec 179264.9AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
7 Apr 179365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
6 Dec 180072.9ResignedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
1801²73.0AppointedAbbot
1 Mar 181486.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manel María Trujillo Jurado:
Bishop Manel María Trujillo Jurado O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albarracin

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 110, Number 576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013