Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Stefano Trevisan

Deceased

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1727Born
13 Apr 175426.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 176739.0SelectedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
16 Feb 176739.1ConfirmedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
14 Oct 179971.8DiedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Stefano Trevisan
Bishop Antonio Stefano Trevisan (born , died ) Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 45.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 369
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast