Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosimo Torelli

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1674Born
14 May 171945.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 171945.0AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
21 May 171945.0Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
27 Aug 173662.3DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Torelli
Bishop Cosimo Torelli (born , died ) Bishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlě, Diocese of Forli

  • a priest for 17.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,719, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast